Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pietro Garlato

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Jan 1928BornUdine
1 Jul 195123.4Ordained PriestPriest of Concordia (Sagittaria), Italy
2 Apr 198658.2AppointedBishop of Palestrina, Italy
19 Apr 198658.2Ordained BishopBishop of Palestrina, Italy
30 Dec 199163.9AppointedBishop of Tivoli, Italy
5 Jul 200375.4RetiredBishop of Tivoli, Italy
29 Apr 201385.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Tivoli, Italy

MicroData Summary for Pietro Garlato:
Bishop Pietro Garlato (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Tivoli

  • a priest for 61.8 years
  • a bishop for 27.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 148, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015