Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Marcelino Sérgio Bicego, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop of Carolina, Maranhão, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
18 Jun 1920Born
26 Jul 194525.1Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
6 Aug 197151.1AppointedPrelate of Carolina, Maranhão, Brazil
6 Aug 197151.1AppointedTitular Bishop of Lydda
24 Oct 197151.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lydda
26 May 197857.9ResignedTitular Bishop of Lydda
16 Oct 197959.3AppointedBishop of Carolina, Maranhão, Brazil
22 Jan 198059.5DiedBishop of Carolina, Maranhão, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Marcelino Sérgio Bicego
Bishop Marcelino Sérgio Bicego O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop of Carolina

  • a priest for 34.4 years
  • a bishop for 8.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 15, Number 786

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast