Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Benedito Araújo

Bishop of Guajará-Mirim, Rondonia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Nov 1963 BornPaço do Lumiar
17 Nov 199127.9Ordained PriestPriest of São Luís do Maranhão, Maranho, Brazil
23 Mar 201147.3AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Guajará-Mirim, Rondonia, Brazil
4 Jun 201147.5Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Guajará-Mirim, Rondonia, Brazil
8 Dec 201148.0SucceededBishop of Guajará-Mirim, Rondonia, Brazil
22 Apr 201551.4AppointedApostolic Administrator of Porto Velho, Rondonia, Brazil
13 Dec 201552.0ResignedApostolic Administrator of Porto Velho, Rondonia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Benedito Araújo:
Bishop Benedito Araújo (born ) Bishop of Guajará-Mirim

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Guajará-Mirim.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Mar 2011
  • ob/c2+: CB, 12 Apr 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 206, Number 17,067
  • s: Bollettino, 9 Dec 2011
  • ab: CB, 22 Apr 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.9, 22 Aug 2015; Data: 11 Nov 2015