Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Miguel Ângelo Freitas Ribeiro

Bishop of Oliveira, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
26 Nov 1958 BornItaguara
11 Jan 198627.1Ordained PriestPriest of Oliveira, Minas Gerais, Brazil
17 Jan 200142.1AppointedBishop of Tocantinópolis, Tocatins, Brazil
31 Mar 200142.3Ordained BishopBishop of Tocantinópolis, Tocatins, Brazil
31 Oct 200748.9AppointedBishop of Oliveira, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Miguel Ângelo Freitas Ribeiro:
Bishop Miguel Ângelo Freitas Ribeiro (born ) Bishop of Oliveira

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Oliveira.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 31 Oct 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,953

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013