Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Hugo María Van Steekelenburg, O.F.M.

Bishop Emeritus of Almenara, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1937 BornWateringen, Netherlands
8 Jun 196426.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
23 Jun 199961.6AppointedBishop of Almenara, Minas Gerais, Brazil
24 Sep 199961.9Ordained BishopBishop of Almenara, Minas Gerais, Brazil
19 Jun 201375.6RetiredBishop of Almenara, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Hugo María Van Steekelenburg:
Bishop Hugo María Van Steekelenburg O.F.M. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Almenara

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Almenara.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 157, Number 13,631
  • r: Bollettino, 19 Jun 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015