Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Cristiano Portela de Araújo Pena

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Aug 1913Born
18 Sep 193724.1Ordained PriestPriest
19 Feb 195945.5AppointedBishop of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil
17 May 195945.7Ordained BishopBishop of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil
26 Mar 197965.6ResignedBishop of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil
2 Aug 200086.9DiedBishop Emeritus of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Cristiano Portela de Araújo Pena
Bishop Cristiano Portela de Araújo Pena (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Divinópolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 62.8 years
  • a bishop for 41.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1959, Number 42
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018