Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Afonso de Miranda, S.D.N.

Bishop Emeritus of Taubaté, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
14 Apr 1920 BornCipotânea
1 Nov 194525.5Ordained PriestPriest of Other
3 Nov 197151.6AppointedBishop of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil
27 Dec 197151.7Ordained BishopBishop of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil
11 Jul 197757.2AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Campanha, Minas Gerais, Brazil
6 Aug 198161.3AppointedBishop of Taubaté, Sao Paulo, Brazil
22 May 199676.1RetiredBishop of Taubaté, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Afonso de Miranda:
Bishop Antônio Afonso de Miranda S.D.N. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Taubaté

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Taubaté.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 25 Sep 2013