Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop João Hipólito de Morais

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lorena, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1924BornQueluz
8 Dec 195127.3Ordained PriestPriest
11 Jul 197752.9AppointedBishop of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil
25 Sep 197753.1Ordained BishopBishop of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil
10 Jan 200176.4RetiredBishop of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil
7 Nov 200480.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Lorena, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for João Hipólito de Morais:
Bishop João Hipólito de Morais (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lorena

  • a priest for 52.9 years
  • a bishop for 27.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 177, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013