Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carmo João Rhoden, S.C.I.

Bishop Emeritus of Taubaté, Sao Paulo, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 May 1939 Born
17 Dec 196627.5Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Priests of the Sacred Heart
22 May 199657.0AppointedBishop of Taubaté, Sao Paulo, Brazil
17 Aug 199657.2Ordained BishopBishop of Taubaté, Sao Paulo, Brazil
15 Apr 201575.9RetiredBishop of Taubaté, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Carmo João Rhoden
Bishop Carmo João Rhoden S.C.I. (born ) Bishop Emeritus of Taubaté

EventPlace
Birth PlaceInhacorá

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Taubaté.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 147, Number 12,841
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)
  • r: Bollettino, 15 Apr 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018