Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Belvino do Nascimento

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Dec 1932Born
2 Dec 195623.9Ordained PriestPriest
27 Jun 198148.4AppointedBishop of Itumbiara, Goias, Brazil
29 Sep 198148.7Ordained BishopBishop of Itumbiara, Goias, Brazil
6 Feb 198754.1AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Patos de Minas, Minas Gerais, Brazil
27 Feb 198956.1AppointedBishop of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil
5 Apr 198956.2InstalledBishop of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil
11 Feb 200976.1RetiredBishop of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil
8 Jan 201986.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Belvino do Nascimento
Bishop José Belvino do Nascimento (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Divinópolis

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMercês
Ordained BishopPlaza of, Nossa Senhora das Brotas, Church, Entre Rios de Minas

  • a priest for 62.0 years
  • a bishop for 37.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 11 Feb 2009
  • d: CB, 8 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 11 Jan 2019

Quantcast