Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Moacir Silva Arantes

Bishop of Barreiras, Bahia, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jun 1969 Born
14 Aug 199930.1Ordained PriestPriest of Divinópolis, Minas Gerais, Brazil
11 May 201646.9AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Goiânia, Goias, Brazil
11 May 201646.9AppointedTitular Bishop of Tituli in Numidia
13 Aug 201647.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Tituli in Numidia
21 Oct 202051.3AppointedBishop of Barreiras, Bahia, Brazil
Jan 2021³51.5InstalledBishop of Barreiras, Bahia, Brazil

Note(s): ³ Day Uncertain

MicroData Summary for Moacir Silva Arantes
Bishop Moacir Silva Arantes (born ) Bishop of Barreiras

EventPlace
Birth PlaceItapecerica
Ordained BishopSão Bento, Itapecerica

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Barreiras.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 May 2016
  • ob: CB, 18 May 2016
  • c2+: CB, 14 Jun 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 229, Number 19,072
  • ab: Bollettino, 21 Oct 2020
  • i: AM, 23 Nov 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 23 Nov 2020

Quantcast