Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Olívio Teodoro Obalhe, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Prelate of Cristalândia, Goias, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Apr 1934Born
22 Sep 196127.4ProfessedMember of Order of Friars Minor
20 Dec 196430.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
12 Mar 198752.9AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Cristalândia, Goias, Brazil
30 Jun 198753.2Ordained BishopCoadjutor Prelate of Cristalândia, Goias, Brazil
11 May 198854.0SucceededPrelate of Cristalândia, Goias, Brazil
29 Sep 198955.4DiedPrelate of Cristalândia, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Olívio Teodoro Obalhe
Bishop Olívio Teodoro Obalhe O.F.M. (born , died ) Prelate of Cristalândia

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArauari

  • a priest for 24.7 years
  • a bishop for 2.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 106, Number 9,257
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 120

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018