Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Alberto Moura, C.S.S.

Archbishop of Montes Claros, Minas Gerais


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Oct 1943 BornItuiutaba
9 Dec 196421.1ProfessedMember of Congregation of the Sacred Stigmata
9 Jan 197127.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Sacred Stigmata
18 Apr 199046.5AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Uberlândia, Minas Gerais, Brazil
14 Jul 199046.7Ordained BishopCoadjutor Bishop of Uberlândia, Minas Gerais, Brazil
23 Dec 199249.2SucceededBishop of Uberlândia, Minas Gerais, Brazil
7 Feb 200763.3AppointedArchbishop of Montes Claros, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Alberto Moura:
Archbishop José Alberto Moura C.S.S. (born ) Archbishop of Montes Claros

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Montes Claros.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Feb 2007
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 123, Number 11,074

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 6 Sep 2013