Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Antônio Roberto Cavuto, O.F.M. Cap.

Bishop of Itapipoca, Ceara, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 May 1944 Born
196520.6Solemn VowsMember of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
24 Jan 197126.6Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
25 May 200561.0AppointedBishop of Itapipoca, Ceara, Brazil
2 Jul 200561.1Ordained BishopBishop of Itapipoca, Ceara, Brazil
31 Jul 200561.1InstalledBishop of Itapipoca, Ceara, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Antônio Roberto Cavuto
Bishop Antônio Roberto Cavuto O.F.M. Cap. (born ) Bishop of Itapipoca

EventPlace
Birth PlaceEspírito Santo do Pinhal
Ordained BishopNossa Senhora do Rosário de Pompéia, Church, Belo Horizonte

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Itapipoca.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 180, Number 14,910
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 242, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.7, 8 Feb 2020; Data: 24 Mar 2020

Quantcast