Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Alves Bezerra, S.S.S.

Bishop of Paracatu, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
23 Apr 1955 Born
5 Jan 198226.7Solemn VowsMember of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
10 Aug 198530.2Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Blessed Sacrament
21 May 200853.0AppointedBishop of Jardim, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
10 Aug 200853.2Ordained BishopBishop of Jardim, Mato Grosso do Sul, Brazil
7 Nov 201257.5AppointedBishop of Paracatu, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jorge Alves Bezerra
Bishop Jorge Alves Bezerra S.S.S. (born ) Bishop of Paracatu

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSão João de Meriti

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Paracatu.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 May 2008
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 195, Number 15,945
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Nov 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast