Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Scarso, O.F.M. Cap. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Patos de Minas, Minas Gerais, Brazil


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Aug 1916Born
28 Jun 194225.8Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor Capuchin
29 Nov 196751.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Patos de Minas, Minas Gerais, Brazil
29 Nov 196751.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Numidia
25 Mar 196851.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Gemellae in Numidia
28 Dec 196852.3AppointedBishop of Patos de Minas, Minas Gerais, Brazil
8 Jan 199275.4RetiredBishop of Patos de Minas, Minas Gerais, Brazil
28 Oct 201599.2DiedBishop Emeritus of Patos de Minas, Minas Gerais, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Jorge Scarso
Bishop Jorge Scarso O.F.M. Cap. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Patos de Minas

EventPlace
Birth PlaceModica, Italy
Ordained BishopSt. Sebastien, Church, Rio de Janeiro, Archdiocese of São Sebastião do Rio de Janeiro

  • a priest for 73.3 years
  • a bishop for 47.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: CB, 28 Oct 2015
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 225, Necrology (back)
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 7, Number 344

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 23 Jun 2019

Quantcast