Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Raimundo de Melo

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Caetité, Bahia

Titular Bishop of Stobi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
11 Feb 1872BornCapelinha
1 Nov 189422.7Ordained PriestPriest of Aracajú, Brazil
18 Aug 191442.5AppointedBishop of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil
21 Feb 191543.0Ordained BishopBishop of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil
19 Mar 191543.1InstalledBishop of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil
30 Jul 192351.5ResignedBishop of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil
30 Jul 192351.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Stobi
11 Mar 194371.1DiedBishop Emeritus of Caetité, Bahia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Manuel Raimundo de Melo:
Bishop Manuel Raimundo de Melo (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Caetité

  • a priest for 48.4 years
  • a bishop for 28.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1915, Number 9
  • b/c2: Hierarchia Catholica Medii et Recentioris Aevi, Volume 9, Page 100

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 9 Jun 2014