Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Edmilson Tadeu Canavarros dos Santos, S.D.B.

Auxiliary Bishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil

Titular Bishop of Feradi Minus


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Dec 1967 Born
31 Jan 198820.1ProfessedMember of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
7 Dec 199629.0Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
12 Oct 201648.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Manaus, Amazonas, Brazil
12 Oct 201648.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Feradi Minus
12 Dec 201649.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Feradi Minus

MicroData Summary for Edmilson Tadeu Canavarros dos Santos
Bishop Edmilson Tadeu Canavarros dos Santos S.D.B. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Manaus

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCorumbá, Diocese of Corumbá, Mato Grosso do Sul
Ordained BishopGinásio Poliesportivo Don Bosco, Campo Grande, Archdiocese of Campo Grande, Mato Grosso do Sul

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Manaus.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2016
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 230, Number 19,225

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 14 Jan 2017