Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Diocese of Rio Branco

Dioecesis Fluminis Albi Superioris



Show: All | General Information | Historical Details | Ordinaries | Historical Summary | Statistics | Affiliated Bishops, Living | Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

Bishop(s)

General Information

  • Type of Jurisdiction: Diocese
  • Elevated: 15 February 1986
  • Metropolitan: Archdiocese of Porto Velho
  • Rite: Latin (or Roman)
  • State: Acre
  • Country: Brazil
  • Square Kilometers: 102,136 (39,450 Square Miles)
  • Conference Region: Norte I
  • Official Web Site: http://www.diocesederiobranco.org.br/
  • Mailing Address: Praca da Catedral 4, 69908-970 Rio Branco, AC, Brazil
  • Telephone: (068)3223-2200
  • Fax: 3223-2101

Historical Details


Past and Present Ordinaries



Historical Summary

DateEventFromTo
Territorial Prelature of Acre e Purus
4 October 1919ErectedDiocese of Amazonas Territorial Prelature of Acre e Purus (erected)
Territorial Prelature of São Peregrino Laziosi no Alto Acre e Alto Purus
10 December 1926Name ChangedTerritorial Prelature of Acre e Purus Territorial Prelature of São Peregrino Laziosi no Alto Acre e Alto Purus
Territorial Prelature of Acre e Purus
26 April 1958Name ChangedTerritorial Prelature of São Peregrino Laziosi no Alto Acre e Alto Purus Territorial Prelature of Acre e Purus
Diocese of Rio Branco
15 February 1986ElevatedTerritorial Prelature of Acre e Purus Diocese of Rio Branco
31 August 2001Metropolitan ChangedDiocese of Rio Branco (from Manaus)

Statistics

YearCatholicsTotal PopulationPercent CatholicDiocesan PriestsReligious PriestsTotal PriestsCatholics Per PriestPermanent DeaconsMale ReligiousFemale ReligiousParishesSource
Territorial Prelature of São Peregrino Laziosi no Alto Acre e Alto Purus
1949100,000100,000100.0%8812,5009155ap1951
Territorial Prelature of Acre e Purus
1966150,000150,000100.0%1141510,0007367ap1967
1968145,000150,00096.7%312159,66612454ap1971
1976190,000265,00071.7%2111314,61514558ap1977
1980145,000197,00073.6%412169,062118659ap1981
Diocese of Rio Branco
1990312,000364,00085.7%9142313,565148915ap1991
1999357,000425,00084.0%7101721,000107118ap2000
2000361,000430,00084.0%8101820,055127918ap2001
2001396,000472,32983.8%9112019,800137919ap2002
2002401,000478,00083.9%11102119,0951119021ap2003
2003347,042433,80380.0%10142414,4601189521ap2004
2004356,658448,06279.6%1862414,8601108421ap2005
2010369,000491,00075.2%21133410,85211259327ap2011
2011378,000502,00075.3%18123012,60023249827ap2012

Note: Any changes in boundaries over time are not indicated in the above table.


Affiliated Bishops, Living

Affiliated Bishops, Deceased

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.0, 19 Jun 2013; data: 10 Jul 2013