Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lorenz Zeller, O.S.B. †

Deceased

Apostolic Administrator of Rio Branco, Acre

Titular Bishop of Dorylaëum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Jul 1873BornRiedlingen, Germany
1 Apr 189925.7Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Saint Benedict
7 Jan 193965.5AppointedApostolic Administrator of Rio Branco, Acre, Brazil
7 Jan 193965.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
5 Feb 193965.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Dorylaëum
1 Sep 194572.1DiedApostolic Administrator of Rio Branco, Acre, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Lorenz Zeller:
Bishop Lorenz Zeller O.S.B. (born , died ) Apostolic Administrator of Rio Branco

  • a priest for 46.4 years
  • a bishop for 6.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1939, Number 3

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013