Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Lino Vomboemmel, O.F.M. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santarém, Para


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Jul 1934BornTeresópolis
15 Dec 196228.4Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Minor
25 May 198146.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santarém, Para, Brazil
25 May 198146.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Iunca in Byzacena
15 Aug 198147.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Iunca in Byzacena
9 Jun 198348.9AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Santarém, Para, Brazil
27 Nov 198551.3SucceededBishop of Santarém, Para, Brazil
28 Feb 200772.6ResignedBishop of Santarém, Para, Brazil
6 Aug 200773.0DiedBishop Emeritus of Santarém, Para, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Lino Vomboemmel:
Bishop Lino Vomboemmel O.F.M. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santarém

  • a priest for 44.6 years
  • a bishop for 26.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 28 Feb 2007
  • d: CB
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013