Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Pedro Luiz Stringhini

Bishop of Mogi das Cruzes, Sao Paulo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
17 Aug 1953 BornLaranjal Paulista
9 Aug 198027.0Ordained PriestPriest of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
3 Jan 200147.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of São Paulo, Sao Paulo, Brazil
3 Jan 200147.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ita
10 Mar 200147.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ita
30 Dec 200956.4AppointedBishop of Franca, Sao Paulo, Brazil
21 Feb 201056.5InstalledBishop of Franca, Sao Paulo, Brazil
19 Sep 201259.1AppointedBishop of Mogi das Cruzes, Sao Paulo, Brazil
24 Nov 201259.3InstalledBishop of Mogi das Cruzes, Sao Paulo, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Pedro Luiz Stringhini:
Bishop Pedro Luiz Stringhini (born ) Bishop of Mogi das Cruzes

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Mogi das Cruzes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2009
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 162, Number 13,927
  • ab: Bollettino, 19 Sep 2012
  • i: CB, 19 Sep 2012

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013