Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop José Francisco Rezende Dias

Archbishop of Niterói, Rio de Janeiro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
2 Apr 1956 BornBrasópolis
10 Nov 197923.6Ordained PriestPriest of Pouso Alegre, Minas Gerais, Brazil
28 Mar 200145.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Pouso Alegre, Minas Gerais, Brazil
28 Mar 200145.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Turres Ammeniae
2 Jun 200145.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Turres Ammeniae
30 Mar 200549.0AppointedBishop of Duque de Caxias, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil
30 Nov 201155.7AppointedArchbishop of Niterói, Rio de Janeiro, Brazil

MicroData Summary for José Francisco Rezende Dias:
Archbishop José Francisco Rezende Dias (born ) Archbishop of Niterói

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Niterói.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 30 Nov 2011
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,983

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013