Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Tomás Balduino, O.P. †

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Goiás, Goias


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
31 Dec 1922BornPosse
4 Jul 194825.5Ordained PriestPriest of Order of Friars Preachers
15 Aug 196744.6AppointedCoadjutor Prelate of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia, Brazil
15 Aug 196744.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Vicus Pacati
10 Nov 196744.9AppointedBishop of Goiás, Goias, Brazil
26 Nov 196744.9Ordained BishopBishop of Goiás, Goias, Brazil
2 Dec 199875.9RetiredBishop of Goiás, Goias, Brazil
2 May 201491.3DiedBishop Emeritus of Goiás, Goias, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Tomás Balduino:
Bishop Tomás Balduino O.P. (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Goiás

  • a priest for 65.8 years
  • a bishop for 46.4 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 133
  • d: CB, 3 May 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 4 May 2014