Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Patrício José Hanrahan, C.SS.R. †

Deceased

Bishop of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Oct 1925BornDublin, Ireland
16 Aug 195327.8Ordained PriestPriest of Congregation of the Most Holy Redeemer
29 Jan 197953.3AppointedPrelate of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia, Para, Brazil
29 Apr 197953.5Ordained BishopPrelate of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia, Para, Brazil
16 Oct 197954.0AppointedBishop of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia, Brazil
25 May 199367.6DiedBishop of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia, Brazil

MicroData Summary for Patrício José Hanrahan:
Bishop Patrício José Hanrahan C.SS.R. (born , died ) Bishop of Santíssima Conceição do Araguaia

  • a priest for 39.8 years
  • a bishop for 14.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 137
  • ob/c2: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Deceased Cardinals (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.3, 27 Sep 2013; data: 3 Oct 2013