Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raúl Martín

Bishop of Santa Rosa


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
9 Oct 1957 BornBuenos Aires
17 Nov 199033.1Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
1 Mar 200648.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
1 Mar 200648.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Troyna
20 May 200648.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Troyna
24 Sep 201356.0AppointedBishop of Santa Rosa, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Raúl Martín:
Bishop Raúl Martín (born ) Bishop of Santa Rosa

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Santa Rosa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 1 Mar 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 185, Number 15,158
  • ab: Bollettino, 24 Sep 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 24 Sep 2013