Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Father Luis Dario Martín

Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Santa Rosa, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Bisenzio


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1961 Born
17 Nov 199029.7Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
20 Mar 201958.0AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Rosa, Argentina
20 Mar 201958.0AppointedTitular Bishop of Bisenzio
1 Jun 201958.2Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Bisenzio

MicroData Summary for Luis Dario Martín
Father Luis Dario Martín (born ) Auxiliary Bishop-Elect of Santa Rosa

EventPlace
Birth PlaceGeneral Pico, Diocese of Santa Rosa
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Luján, Basilica, Luján

Please contact the Father through the Diocese of Santa Rosa.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Mar 2019
  • c1: CB, 20 Mar 2019
  • ob: CB, 30 Mar 2019
  • c2+: CB, 11 Apr 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.4, 3 Mar 2019; Data: 13 Apr 2019

Quantcast