Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Ernesto Giobando, S.J.

Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Appiaria


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Dec 1959 Born
17 Nov 199030.9Ordained PriestPriest of Society of Jesus
5 Mar 201454.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
5 Mar 201454.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Appiaria
3 May 201454.3Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Appiaria

MicroData Summary for Ernesto Giobando
Bishop Ernesto Giobando S.J. (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSanta Fe de la Vera Cruz

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Buenos Aires.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 5 Mar 2014
  • c1: CB, 5 Mar 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 13 Mar 2014
  • c3+: CB, 9 Apr 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 218, Number 18,149

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.7, 12 Sep 2017; Data: 29 Nov 2017