Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Horacio Ernesto Benites Astoul

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Buenos Aires

Titular Bishop of Lamzella


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Nov 1933BornBuenos Aires
22 Sep 196228.8Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
16 Mar 199965.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
16 Mar 199965.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Lamzella
1 May 199965.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lamzella
1 Dec 200875.0RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
25 May 201682.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Horacio Ernesto Benites Astoul
Bishop Horacio Ernesto Benites Astoul (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Buenos Aires

  • a priest for 53.6 years
  • a bishop for 17.0 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • r: Bollettino, 1 Dec 2008
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Number 13,508
  • d: CB, 25 May 2016

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2016
Code: web_b, v3.1.4, 5 May 2016; Data: 26 May 2016