Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gustavo Oscar Carrara

Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Thasbalta


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 May 1973 Born
24 Oct 199825.4Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
20 Nov 201744.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
20 Nov 201744.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Thasbalta
16 Dec 201744.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Thasbalta

MicroData Summary for Gustavo Oscar Carrara
Bishop Gustavo Oscar Carrara (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained BishopCathedral, Buenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Buenos Aires.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Nov 2017
  • c1: CB, 20 Nov 2017
  • ob/c2+: CB, 28 Nov 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 234, Number 19,618

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast