Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Óscar Vicente Ojea Quintana

Bishop of San Isidro


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
15 Oct 1946 BornBuenos Aires
25 Nov 197226.1Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
24 May 200659.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
24 May 200659.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Suelli
2 Sep 200659.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Suelli
7 Oct 200963.0AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of San Isidro, Argentina
30 Dec 201165.2SucceededBishop of San Isidro, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Óscar Vicente Ojea Quintana:
Bishop Óscar Vicente Ojea Quintana (born ) Bishop of San Isidro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Isidro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 24 May 2006
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 186, Number 15,232
  • ab: Bollettino, 7 Oct 2009
  • s: Bollettino, 30 Dec 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
code: v2.9.8, 8 Mar 2014; data: 10 Apr 2014