Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Raúl Pizarro

Auxiliary Bishop of San Isidro, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Ausana


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Mar 1973 Born
23 Oct 199825.6Ordained PriestPriest of San Isidro, Argentina
19 Dec 202047.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of San Isidro, Argentina
19 Dec 202047.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Ausana
26 Feb 202147.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ausana

MicroData Summary for Raúl Pizarro
Bishop Raúl Pizarro (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of San Isidro

EventPlace
Birth PlaceSan Isidro, Diocese of San Isidro
Ordained BishopColegio Marín, San Isidro, Diocese of San Isidro

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Isidro.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2020
  • c1: CB, 19 Dec 2020
  • ob: CB, 4 Feb 2021
  • c2+: CB, 16 Feb 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.2, 28 Jan 2021; Data: 26 Feb 2021

Quantcast