Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gustavo Óscar Zanchetta

Bishop of Orán


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Feb 1964 BornRosario
13 Dec 199127.8Ordained PriestPriest of Quilmes, Argentina
23 Jul 201349.4AppointedBishop of Orán, Argentina
19 Aug 201349.5Ordained BishopBishop of Orán, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Gustavo Óscar Zanchetta:
Bishop Gustavo Óscar Zanchetta (born ) Bishop of Orán

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Orán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 23 Jul 2013
  • c1: CB, 23 Jul 2013
  • ob/c2+: CB, 1 Aug 2013

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013