Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Carlos José Tissera

Bishop of Quilmes


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
10 Sep 1951 BornRio Cuarto
7 Apr 197826.5Ordained PriestPriest of Villa de la Concepción del Río Cuarto, Argentina
16 Nov 200453.1AppointedBishop of San Francisco, Argentina
6 Feb 200553.4Ordained BishopBishop of San Francisco, Argentina
27 Feb 200553.4InstalledBishop of San Francisco, Argentina
12 Oct 201160.0AppointedBishop of Quilmes, Argentina
17 Dec 201160.2InstalledBishop of Quilmes, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Carlos José Tissera:
Bishop Carlos José Tissera (born ) Bishop of Quilmes

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Quilmes.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 178, Number 14,822
  • b/ab: Bollettino, 12 Oct 2011
  • i: CB, 19 Oct 2011

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.2, 19 Jan 2015; Data: 30 Jan 2015