Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Roberto José Ferrari

Auxiliary Bishop of Tucumán, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Pinhel


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1965 Born
19 Dec 199227.0Ordained DeaconDeacon of Río Cuarto, Argentina
19 Sep 199327.8Ordained PriestPriest of Río Cuarto, Argentina
10 Oct 202054.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Tucumán, Argentina
10 Oct 202054.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Pinhel
2 Jan 202155.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Pinhel

MicroData Summary for Roberto José Ferrari
Bishop Roberto José Ferrari (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Tucumán

EventPlace
Birth PlaceUcacha, Diocese of Río Cuarto
Ordained BishopSan Francisco Solano, Church, Río Cuarto, Diocese of Villa de la Concepción del Río Cuarto

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Tucumán.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2020
  • ob: CB, 18 Nov 2020
  • c23: CB, 1 Dec 2020
  • c4+: CB, 2 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 3 Jan 2021

Quantcast