Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Archbishop Marcelo Daniel Colombo

Archbishop of Mendoza, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
27 Mar 1961 Born
16 Dec 198827.7Ordained PriestPriest of Quilmes, Argentina
8 May 200948.1AppointedBishop of Orán, Argentina
8 Aug 200948.3Ordained BishopBishop of Orán, Argentina
22 Aug 200948.4InstalledBishop of Orán, Argentina
9 Jul 201352.2AppointedBishop of La Rioja, Argentina
22 May 201857.1AppointedArchbishop of Mendoza, Argentina
11 Aug 201857.3InstalledArchbishop of Mendoza, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Marcelo Daniel Colombo
Archbishop Marcelo Daniel Colombo (born ) Archbishop of Mendoza

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained BishopIn front of, Immaculada Concepción, Cathedral, Quilmes, Diocese of Quilmes

Please contact the Archbishop through the Archdiocese of Mendoza.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 8 May 2009
  • ob/c2+: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 199, Number 16,256
  • ab: Bollettino, 9 Jul 2013
  • ab: Bollettino, 22 May 2018
  • i: CB, 29 Jun 2018

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 29 Jun 2018

Quantcast