Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Gabriel Bernardo Barba

Bishop of Gregorio de Laferrere, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Apr 1964 Born
12 Aug 198925.3Ordained PriestPriest of Morón, Argentina
13 May 199733.0IncardinatedPriest of Merlo-Moreno, Argentina
19 Dec 201349.6AppointedBishop of Gregorio de Laferrere, Argentina
1 Mar 201449.8Ordained BishopBishop of Gregorio de Laferrere, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Gabriel Bernardo Barba
Bishop Gabriel Bernardo Barba (born ) Bishop of Gregorio de Laferrere

EventPlace
Birth PlaceMorón

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gregorio de Laferrere.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 19 Dec 2013
  • ob: CB, 29 Dec 2013
  • c2: CB, 16 Feb 2014
  • c34: CB, 27 Feb 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 217, Number 18,106

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.9, 28 Apr 2018; Data: 30 Apr 2018

Quantcast