Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Desiderio Elso Collino

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Lomas de Zamora


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
21 Mar 1926BornFirmat
4 Apr 195327.0Ordained PriestPriest
21 Jan 197245.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Rosario, Argentina
21 Jan 197245.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Buxentum
13 Feb 197245.9Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Buxentum
7 Nov 197246.6AppointedBishop of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina
15 Dec 197246.7InstalledBishop of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina
24 Apr 200175.1RetiredBishop of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina
4 Oct 200276.5DiedBishop Emeritus of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Desiderio Elso Collino:
Bishop Desiderio Elso Collino (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Lomas de Zamora

  • a priest for 49.5 years
  • a bishop for 30.6 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.5, 24 Dec 2013; data: 30 Dec 2013