Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Vázquez

Coadjutor Bishop of Morón, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
13 Mar 1950 Born
31 Mar 198333.0Ordained PriestPriest of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina
3 Dec 201363.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina
3 Dec 201363.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Castra Nova
29 Dec 201363.7Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Castra Nova
3 Feb 201766.8AppointedCoadjutor Bishop of Morón, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Jorge Vázquez
Bishop Jorge Vázquez (born ) Coadjutor Bishop of Morón

EventPlace
Birth PlaceLomas de Zamora

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Morón.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 3 Dec 2013
  • c1: CB, 3 Dec 2013
  • ob: CB, 7 Dec 2013
  • c2: CB, 13 Dec 2013
  • c34: CB, 15 Dec 2013
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 2013, Number 168
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 216, Number 18,001
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Feb 2017

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 3 Feb 2017