Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Justo Rodríguez Gallego

Auxiliary Bishop of Zárate-Campana, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Nomentum


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
29 Nov 1954 Born
6 Jul 198025.6Ordained PriestPriest of Toledo, Spain
7 Nov 201560.9AppointedAdministrator of Zárate-Campana, Argentina
19 Dec 201561.0CeasedAdministrator of Zárate-Campana, Argentina
10 Oct 202065.8AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Zárate-Campana, Argentina
10 Oct 202065.8AppointedTitular Bishop of Nomentum
9 Jan 202166.1Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Nomentum

MicroData Summary for Justo Rodríguez Gallego
Bishop Justo Rodríguez Gallego (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Zárate-Campana

EventPlace
Birth PlaceDon Benito, Diocese of Badajoz, Spain
Ordained BishopFiesta Nacional de la Flor, Belén de Escobar

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Zárate-Campana.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 10 Oct 2020
  • ob: CB, 9 Dec 2020
  • c2+: CB, 6 Jan 2021
  • ob.loc: CB, 9 Jan 2021

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2021
Code: web_b, v3.3.1, 10 Dec 2020; Data: 10 Jan 2021

Quantcast