Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Martín Torres Carbonell

Bishop of Gregorio de Laferrere, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Apr 1954 Born
18 Nov 198329.5Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
21 Nov 201460.5AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina
21 Nov 201460.5AppointedTitular Bishop of Aquae in Byzacena
27 Feb 201560.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aquae in Byzacena
30 Jun 202066.1AppointedBishop of Gregorio de Laferrere, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Jorge Martín Torres Carbonell
Bishop Jorge Martín Torres Carbonell (born ) Bishop of Gregorio de Laferrere

EventPlace
Birth PlaceBuenos Aires, Archdiocese of Buenos Aires
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de la Paz, Cathedral, Lomas de Zamora, Diocese of Lomas de Zamora

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Gregorio de Laferrere.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 21 Nov 2014
  • c1: CB, 21 Nov 2014
  • ob/c2: CB, 5 Dec 2014
  • c34: CB, 29 Dec 2014
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 222, Number 18,376
  • ab: Bollettino, 30 Jun 2020

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.2.9, 13 Apr 2020; Data: 30 Jun 2020

Quantcast