Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Eduardo Horacio García

Bishop of San Justo


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
22 Jan 1956 BornBuenos Aires
18 Nov 198327.8Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
21 Jun 200347.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
21 Jun 200347.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Ipagro
16 Aug 200347.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Ipagro
6 Nov 201458.8AppointedBishop of San Justo, Argentina
14 Dec 201458.9InstalledBishop of San Justo, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Eduardo Horacio García:
Bishop Eduardo Horacio García (born ) Bishop of San Justo

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of San Justo.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 172, Number 14,439
  • ab: Bollettino, 6 Nov 2014
  • i: CB, 13 Nov 2014

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2014
Code: web_b, v3.0.0, 8 Nov 2014; Data: 14 Nov 2014