Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop José Antonio Gentico

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Mizigi


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
28 Nov 1931Born
30 Nov 196837.0Ordained PriestPriest of Morón, Argentina
21 Mar 200169.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
21 Mar 200169.3AppointedTitular Bishop of Mizigi
28 Apr 200169.4Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mizigi
5 Apr 200775.3DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina

MicroData Summary for José Antonio Gentico
Bishop José Antonio Gentico (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires

EventPlace
Birth PlaceArnedo, Spain

  • a priest for 38.3 years
  • a bishop for 5.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: CB
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 163, Number 13,968
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 191, Necrology (back)

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2018
Code: web_b, v3.1.8, 1 Jan 2018; Data: 2 Jan 2018