Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Juan Carlos Maccarone

Deceased

Bishop Emeritus of Santiago del Estero


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
19 Oct 1940BornBuenos Aires
17 Dec 196828.1Ordained PriestPriest
30 Jan 199352.2AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina
30 Jan 199352.2AppointedTitular Bishop of Mauriana
21 Apr 199352.5Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Mauriana
3 Jul 199655.7AppointedBishop of Chascomús, Argentina
24 Sep 199655.9InstalledBishop of Chascomús, Argentina
18 Feb 199958.3AppointedBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
29 May 199958.6InstalledBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
19 Aug 200564.8ResignedBishop of Santiago del Estero, Argentina
29 Mar 201574.4DiedBishop Emeritus of Santiago del Estero, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Juan Carlos Maccarone:
Bishop Juan Carlos Maccarone (born , died ) Bishop Emeritus of Santiago del Estero

  • a priest for 46.2 years
  • a bishop for 21.9 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 134, Number 12,066
  • d: CB, 29 Mar 2015

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2015
Code: web_b, v3.0.4, 21 Mar 2015; Data: 30 Mar 2015