Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Jorge Ignacio García Cuerva

Bishop of Río Gallegos, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
12 Apr 1968 Born
24 Oct 199729.5Ordained PriestPriest of San Isidro, Argentina
20 Nov 201749.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Lomas de Zamora, Argentina
20 Nov 201749.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Lacubaza
3 Mar 201849.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Lacubaza
3 Jan 201950.7AppointedBishop of Río Gallegos, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Jorge Ignacio García Cuerva
Bishop Jorge Ignacio García Cuerva (born ) Bishop of Río Gallegos

EventPlace
Birth PlaceRío Gallegos
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de la Paz, Cathedral, Lomas de Zamora, Diocese of Lomas de Zamora

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Río Gallegos.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 20 Nov 2017
  • c1: CB, 20 Nov 2017
  • ob/c2: CB, 28 Nov 2017
  • c3+: CB, 29 Nov 2017
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 235, Number 19,683
  • ab: Bollettino, 3 Jan 2019

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2019
Code: web_b, v3.2.2, 14 Oct 2018; Data: 3 Jan 2019

Quantcast