Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Esteban María Laxague, S.D.B.

Bishop of Viedma, Argentina


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
4 Mar 1957 Born
10 May 198225.1Ordained PriestPriest of Salesians of Saint John Bosco
31 Oct 200245.6AppointedBishop of Viedma, Argentina
21 Dec 200245.7Ordained BishopBishop of Viedma, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Esteban María Laxague
Bishop Esteban María Laxague S.D.B. (born ) Bishop of Viedma

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCoronel Pringles

Please contact the Bishop through the Diocese of Viedma.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 169, Number 14,295

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2017
Code: web_b, v3.1.6, 3 Jan 2017; Data: 17 Jul 2017