Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Horacio José Álvarez

Auxiliary Bishop of Córdoba, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Cubda


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
24 Feb 1957 Born
3 Dec 198124.7Ordained PriestPriest of Córdoba, Argentina
11 Aug 202366.4AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Córdoba, Argentina
11 Aug 202366.4AppointedTitular Bishop of Cubda
3 Nov 202366.6Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Cubda

MicroData Summary for Horacio José Álvarez
(WikiData: Q121365534)
Bishop Horacio José Álvarez (born ) Auxiliary Bishop of Córdoba

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCórdoba, Archdiocese of Córdoba
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de la Asunción, Cathedral, Córdoba, Archdiocese of Córdoba

Please contact the Bishop through the Archdiocese of Córdoba.

  • a priest for years
  • a bishop for years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b: Bollettino, 11 Aug 2023
  • ob/c2: CB, 6 Oct 2023
  • c3+: CB, 2 Nov 2023

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2023
Code: web_b, v3.3.4, 13 Nov 2022; Data: 4 Nov 2023