Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Nicolás Cardinal Fasolino

Deceased

Archbishop of Santa Fe

Cardinal-Priest of Beata Maria Vergine Addolorata a piazza Buenos Aires


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
3 Jan 1887BornBuenos Aires
28 Oct 190922.8Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
20 Oct 193245.8AppointedBishop of Santa Fe, Argentina
21 Dec 193246.0Ordained BishopBishop of Santa Fe, Argentina
29 Dec 193246.0InstalledBishop of Santa Fe, Argentina
20 Apr 193447.3AppointedArchbishop of Santa Fe, Argentina
26 Jun 196780.5Elevated to Cardinal
26 Jun 196780.5AppointedCardinal-Priest of Beata Maria Vergine Addolorata a piazza Buenos Aires
13 Aug 196982.6DiedArchbishop of Santa Fe, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Nicolás Fasolino:
Cardinal Nicolás Fasolino (born , died ) Archbishop of Santa Fe

  • a priest for 59.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.6 years
  • a cardinal for 2.1 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1932, Number 89

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013