Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Manuel Augusto Cárdenas

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Argentina, Faithful of the Eastern Rites

Titular Bishop of Aulon


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Jul 1917BornBuenos Aires
22 Sep 194528.2Ordained PriestPriest of Buenos Aires, Argentina
7 Apr 196244.7AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
7 Apr 196244.7AppointedTitular Bishop of Aulon
29 Apr 196244.8Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Aulon
22 Apr 197557.8ResignedAuxiliary Bishop of Buenos Aires, Argentina
11 Nov 197558.3AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Argentina, Faithful of the Eastern Rites
11 Feb 199274.6RetiredAuxiliary Bishop of Argentina, Faithful of the Eastern Rites
28 Jul 199881.0DiedAuxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Argentina, Faithful of the Eastern Rites

MicroData Summary for Manuel Augusto Cárdenas:
Bishop Manuel Augusto Cárdenas (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop Emeritus of Argentina, Faithful of the Eastern Rites

  • a priest for 52.8 years
  • a bishop for 36.2 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • d: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 154, Necrology (back)
  • b/c2+: Revue des Ordinations Épiscopales, Issue 1962, Number 47

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Conclaves | Consistories | Councils

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2013
code: v2.9.2, 21 Aug 2013; data: 4 Sep 2013