Catholic-Hierarchy DC

Bishop Enrique Principe

Deceased

Auxiliary Bishop of Santa Fe, Argentina

Titular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae


Events

DateAgeEventTitle
16 Mar 1912Born
22 Sep 193422.5Ordained PriestPriest
28 Nov 195745.6AppointedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Fe, Argentina
28 Nov 195745.6AppointedTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae
16 Mar 195846.0Ordained BishopTitular Bishop of Abila Lysaniae
7 Oct 197462.5DiedAuxiliary Bishop of Santa Fe, Argentina

MicroData Summary for Enrique Principe
Bishop Enrique Principe (born , died ) Auxiliary Bishop of Santa Fe

EventPlace
Birth PlaceCalchaquí, Archdiocese of Santa Fe
Ordained BishopNuestra Señora de Guadalupe, Church, Santa Fe, Archdiocese of Santa Fe

  • a priest for 40.0 years
  • a bishop for 16.5 years
Episcopal Lineage / Apostolic Succession:

Source(s):
  • ob/c2+: Le Petit Episcopologe, Issue 36, Number 2,184
  • b/c2+: Les Ordinations Épiscopales, Year 1958, Number 16

============

Home | Countries | Religious Orders | Popes | Holy See | Roman Curia | Cardinals by Rank
Bishops: All | Living | Deceased | Youngest | Oldest | Cardinal Electors
Dioceses: All | Current Only | Titular | Vacant | Structured View
Events: Overview | Recent | by Date | by Year | Necrology
Ad Limina | Conclaves | Consistories | Councils
Eastern Catholic Churches

============

About Catholic-Hierarchy
Terminology/Site Help
[ Comments/Corrections ] Copyright David M. Cheney, 1996-2020
Code: web_b, v3.3.0, 24 Sep 2020; Data: 18 Nov 2020

Quantcast